Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/15/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/15/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/17/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/29/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/19/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/24/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/18/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/28/2012