Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/26/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 01/26/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 01/26/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/08/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/08/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/08/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 02/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 02/08/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/14/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/14/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/14/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 02/14/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/14/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/14/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/28/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/03/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/16/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/11/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/14/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 08/26/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/01/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/01/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/06/2011