Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 02/14/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 02/14/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/27/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/05/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/06/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/06/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/16/2012