There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Paying a Fair Share Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reduce the deficit by imposing a minimum effective tax rate for high-income taxpayers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/06/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/07/2012Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H522)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2012Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/07/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/07/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/07/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/07/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/15/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/15/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/16/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/16/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/16/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 04/16/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/16/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/16/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/16/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/17/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/17/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/17/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/17/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/17/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/19/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/24/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/07/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/05/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/06/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3903. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2012)

Paying a Fair Share Act of 2012 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to require an individual taxpayer whose adjusted gross income exceeds $1 million to pay a minimum tax rate of 30% of the excess of the taxpayer's adjusted gross income over the taxpayer's modified charitable contribution deduction for the taxable year (tentative fair share tax). Establishes the amount of such tax as the excess (if any) of the tentative fair share tax over the excess of: (1) the sum of the taxpayer's regular tax liability, the alternative minimum tax (AMT) amount, and the payroll tax for the taxable year; over (2) certain tax credits. Provides for a phase-in of such tax. Requires an inflation adjustment to the $1 million income threshold for taxable years beginning after 2013.

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that Congress should enact tax reform that repeals unfair and unnecessary tax loopholes and expenditures, simplifies the tax system, and makes sure that the wealthiest taxpayers pay a fair share of taxes.