Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/07/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/07/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/07/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/07/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/15/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/15/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/16/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/16/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/16/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 04/16/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/16/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/16/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/16/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/17/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/17/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/17/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/17/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/17/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/19/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/24/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/07/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/05/2012