Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/07/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 02/07/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 02/07/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 02/07/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 02/07/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/07/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/07/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/07/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/08/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/08/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/29/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/05/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/13/2012