Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/24/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/24/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/26/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/02/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/21/2011