Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/08/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/08/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/08/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/13/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/13/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/13/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/16/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/27/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/05/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/05/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/21/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/12/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/19/2012