Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/14/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/14/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/15/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/15/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/15/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/16/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/01/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/07/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/16/2012