Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/27/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/27/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/06/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/06/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/06/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/19/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/19/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/19/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/05/2012