Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/28/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/28/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 02/28/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/07/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/07/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/16/2012