Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/08/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/06/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/06/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/06/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/13/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/13/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/19/2012