Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/05/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/18/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/24/2012