Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/24/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/24/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/27/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/27/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/28/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/29/2012