Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/14/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/14/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/28/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/20/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/21/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/21/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/21/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/26/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/26/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/28/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/28/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/29/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/29/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/17/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/17/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/17/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 04/17/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 04/19/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/15/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/18/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/28/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 07/17/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/01/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/03/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/30/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew