Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/14/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/17/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/27/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/27/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/27/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/21/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/25/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/07/2012