Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
04/14/2011 Became Public Law No: 112-9.
04/14/2011 Signed by President.
04/06/2011 Presented to President.
04/05/2011 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate, under the order of 3/31/2011, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 87 - 12. Record Vote Number: 49.
03/03/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 314 - 112 (Roll No. 162).(text: CR H1529-1530)
02/22/2011 Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 112-15.
01/12/2011 Introduced in House