There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Energizing America through Employment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To approve the Keystone XL pipeline project, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/09/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
05/07/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/07/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/10/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/10/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/09/2012Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2012Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2012Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2012Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/09/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/09/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/14/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 02/15/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/15/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/15/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/17/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/17/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/24/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/24/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/27/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/19/2012

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/09/2012 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials02/10/2012 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/09/2012 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power02/10/2012 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/09/2012 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs02/09/2012 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade05/07/2012 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere05/07/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4000. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/09/2012)

Energizing America through Employment Act - Authorizes TransCanada Keystone Pipeline, L.P. to construct, connect, operate, and maintain pipeline facilities for the import of crude oil and other hydrocarbons at the United States-Canada Border at Phillips County, Montana, in accordance with a certain application filed with the Department of State on September 19, 2008.

Declares that no permit pursuant to Executive Order 13337 or any other similar Executive Order regulating such activities at the U.S. border, and no additional environmental impact statement (EIS), shall be required for such Pipeline.

Deems a certain EIS issued by the Department of State to satisfy all requirements of the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 (NEPA) as well as any other law requiring federal agency consultation or review regarding such cross-border facilities.

Sets forth conditions governing construction, connection, operation, and maintenance of the cross-border facilities in connection with the Pipeline.

Deems sufficient for the purposes of this Act any route and construction, mitigation, and reclamation measures for the Pipeline in the state of Nebraska that is identified by Nebraska and submitted to the Secretary of State.

States that any action taken to implement this Act does not constitute a major federal action requiring an EIS under NEPA.

Restricts to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit any federal judicial review over actions and facilities implemented under this Act.

Instructs the Secretary of State, for purposes of making a national interest determination under Executive Order 13337 (or any successor Executive Order) regarding a pipeline application, to solicit the views of specified congressional committees regarding such application and pertinent information.