Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 02/09/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/09/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/09/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/14/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 02/15/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/15/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/15/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/17/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/17/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/24/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/24/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/27/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/19/2012