There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Research Public Access Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for Federal agencies to develop public access policies relating to research conducted by employees of that agency or from funds administered by that agency.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/09/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/09/2012Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2012Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E174)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (34)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/19/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/19/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/19/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/19/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/19/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/19/2012
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/19/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/19/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/19/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/19/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/19/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/07/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/27/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/27/2012
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/19/2012 05/10/2012 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform02/09/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4004. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/09/2012)

Federal Research Public Access Act of 2012 - Requires each federal agency with extramural research expenditures of over $100 million to develop a specified federal research public access policy that is consistent with, and that advances, the purposes of the agency.

Makes each federal research public access policy applicable to: (1) researchers employed by the federal agency whose works remain in the public domain; and (2) researchers funded by the agency. Specifies exclusions.

Requires the submission of annual reports by each federal agency on its federal research public access policy.