Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/19/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/19/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/19/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/19/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/19/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/19/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/19/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/19/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/19/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/19/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/07/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/27/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/27/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew