There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

GAPS Act
Gauging American Port Security Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

GAPS Act
Gauging American Port Security Act

Short Titles as Introduced

GAPS Act
Gauging American Port Security Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to conduct a study and report to Congress on gaps in port security in the United States and a plan to address them.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/28/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 9 (Roll no. 439).(text: CR 6/26/2012 H4009)
05/30/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-499.
02/09/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
06/29/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/28/2012-2:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/28/2012-2:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 9 (Roll no. 439). (text: CR 6/26/2012 H4009)
06/28/2012-2:16pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4176-4177)
06/26/2012-4:49pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. King (NY) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
06/26/2012-4:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4005.
06/26/2012-4:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4009-4011)
06/26/2012-4:34pmHouseMr. King (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/30/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 352.
05/30/2012HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-499.
05/09/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/09/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/09/2012HouseSubcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Discharged.
02/17/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
02/09/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
02/09/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security02/09/2012 Referred to
05/09/2012 Markup by
05/30/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-499
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security02/17/2012 Referred to
05/09/2012 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/29/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4005.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4005. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/28/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 30, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Gauging American Port Security Act or the GAPS Act - Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) conduct a study of gaps in U.S. port security and submit to Congress a report (in classified form but with an unclassified annex) that includes a prioritization of such gaps and a plan for addressing them; (2) share relevant information with designated points of contact from federal agencies, state, local, or tribal governments, and port system owners and operators in accordance with rules for the handling of classified information; and (3) help expedite the clearance process if a designated point of contact does not have the necessary security clearance to receive such information.