Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/17/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/07/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/09/2012