Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/09/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/09/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/09/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/09/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/09/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/09/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/14/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/14/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/16/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/18/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/09/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/17/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/01/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/11/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/23/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/23/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/07/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/07/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/17/2012