Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/14/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 02/14/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/14/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 02/14/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 02/14/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/10/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/05/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/05/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/10/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2012