Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/14/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/17/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/17/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/28/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/06/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/22/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/22/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 04/17/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 05/31/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/05/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/25/2012