Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/26/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/26/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/26/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/26/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/26/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/10/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/10/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/10/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/01/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/03/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/11/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/11/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/17/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/30/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/30/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/07/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/25/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/25/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/22/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/11/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/11/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/19/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/01/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/26/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 08/26/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/26/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 08/26/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/26/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/09/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/12/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/12/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/20/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 10/05/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 11/02/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/18/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/29/2012