Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/15/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/05/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/05/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/07/2012