Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
05/25/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-120.
05/25/2012 Signed by President.
05/18/2012 Presented to President.
05/17/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3292)
05/15/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2695-2696)
02/15/2012 Introduced in House