There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modify the Department of Defense Program Guidance relating to the award of Post-Deployment/Mobilization Respite Absence administrative absence days to members of the reserve components to exempt any member whose qualified mobilization commenced before October 1, 2011, and continued on or after that date, from the changes to the program guidance that took effect on that date.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
05/25/2012Became Public Law No: 112-120. (TXT | PDF)
05/25/2012Signed by President.
05/18/2012Presented to President.
05/17/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3292)
05/15/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2695-2696)
02/15/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/25/2012Became Public Law No: 112-120. (TXT | PDF)
05/25/2012Signed by President.
05/18/2012HousePresented to President.
05/17/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/17/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3292)
05/16/2012SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
05/15/2012-7:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/15/2012-7:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2695-2696)
05/15/2012-7:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4045.
05/15/2012-7:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2695-2698)
05/15/2012-7:12pmHouseMr. Kline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/15/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/15/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
02/15/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/16/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/28/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/20/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/22/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/22/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/26/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/26/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/26/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/26/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/28/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/29/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/10/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/15/2012 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel03/15/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4045. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-120 (05/25/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on May 15, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the Secretary of Defense to determine that the changes made to the program guidance relating to the award of Post-Deployment/Mobilization Respite Absence administrative absence days or other authorized benefits described herein to members and former members of the reserves under a specified Department of Defense (DOD) instruction shall not apply to current or former reservists whose qualified mobilization commenced before October 1, 2011, and continued until the termination of the mobilization.

Includes within such authorized benefits: (1) the payment of up to $200 per day for each day the individual would have qualified for a day of administrative absence had the above changes not applied to the individual, in the case of a former member of the Armed Forces; (2) either one day of administrative absence or up to $200 per day as described above, in the case of a member on active duty at the time of the provision of benefits; and (3) either one day of administrative absence to be retained for future use or up to $200 per day as described above, in the case of a member serving in the Selected Reserve, Inactive National Guard, or Individual Ready Reserve at the time of the provision of benefits. Excludes such additional benefits for former members discharged or released under other than honorable conditions.

Terminates the benefit authority under this Act on October 1, 2014.

Directs the Secretary to transfer specified funds from the Pentagon Reservation Maintenance Revolving Fund as a funding offset for such benefits.