Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/16/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/28/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/26/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/28/2012