Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/16/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/28/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/20/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/22/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/22/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/26/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/26/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/26/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/26/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/28/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/29/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/10/2012