Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/15/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/15/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/15/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/15/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/16/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/27/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/28/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/29/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/20/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/10/2012