Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/28/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/28/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/20/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/29/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/19/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/19/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2012