Refine your search

8 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
01/10/2013 Became Public Law No: 112-248.
01/10/2013 Signed by President.
12/31/2012 Presented to President.
12/20/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/13/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 0 (Roll no. 626).(text: CR H6768-6770)
11/30/2012 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 112-698.
02/16/2012 Introduced in House