Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/28/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/28/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/25/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/10/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/10/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/10/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/10/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/31/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/31/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/31/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/05/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/19/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/11/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/11/2012