There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Transparency of Education Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to develop a comprehensive policy to improve outreach and transparency to veterans and members of the Armed Forces through the provision of information on institutions of higher learning, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
01/10/2013Became Public Law No: 112-249. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2013Signed by President.
01/01/2013Presented to President.
12/30/2012Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 3 (Roll no. 650).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7439-7440)
12/19/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2012Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/11/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5817-5818)
09/10/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 112-646.
02/16/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber
01/10/2013Became Public Law No: 112-249. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2013Signed by President.
01/01/2013HousePresented to President.
12/30/2012-7:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/30/2012-7:05pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 3 (Roll no. 650). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7439-7440)
12/30/2012-6:59pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7465-7466)
12/30/2012-4:45pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Michaud objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
12/30/2012-4:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 4057.
12/30/2012-4:31pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7439-7442)
12/20/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2012SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2012SenateS.Amdt.3405 Amendment SA 3405 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2012SenateS.Amdt.3405 Amendment SA 3405 proposed by Senator Merkley for Senator Murray. (consideration: CR S8229) In the nature of a substitute.
12/19/2012SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8229)
12/19/2012SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/12/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/11/2012-4:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/11/2012-4:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5817-5818)
09/11/2012-3:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4057.
09/11/2012-3:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5817-5821)
09/11/2012-3:58pmHouseMr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/10/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 464.
09/10/2012HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 112-646.
07/11/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/11/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/28/2012HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
06/28/2012HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
03/08/2012HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
02/24/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/16/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/16/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/16/2012 Referred to
07/11/2012 Markup by
09/10/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-646
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity02/24/2012 Referred to
03/08/2012 Hearings by
06/28/2012 Markup by
06/28/2012 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs09/12/2012 Referred to
12/19/2012 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4057.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4057. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-249 (01/10/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 19, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to develop a comprehensive policy to improve outreach and transparency to veterans and members of the Armed Forces (members) through the provision of information on institutions of higher learning. Requires such information to: (1) include accreditation information and a description of available federal aid programs, and (2) be provided through hyperlinks on the VA website. Requires the Secretary, in developing the policy, to conduct a market survey to determine the availability of a commercially available off-the-shelf online tool that: (1) allows veterans to determine whether they are academically ready to engage in postsecondary education and training opportunities, and (2) provides a list of providers of such opportunities. Directs the Secretary to report to the congressional veterans and education committees on: (1) the policy developed, (2) a plan to implement the policy, and (3) survey results.

Prohibits the Secretary from approving an educational institution that provides any commission, bonus, or other incentive payment based on success in securing enrollments.

Directs the Secretary to ensure that the VA provides assistance to personnel of educational institutions who are charged with submitting reports or certifications to the VA.

Prohibits the Secretary from paying more than $395 million in VA employee incentive awards or performance bonuses during FY2013.