Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/16/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/17/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/31/2012