Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/27/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/10/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/16/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/18/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/18/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/29/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/30/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/01/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/08/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/08/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/08/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/19/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/20/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/25/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/26/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/11/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/12/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/17/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 07/17/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 08/02/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/13/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/13/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/13/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/13/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/13/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/13/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/14/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/14/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/14/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/18/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 09/28/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/28/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/28/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/28/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/09/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/09/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/09/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/09/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/19/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/19/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/30/2012