Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/21/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/21/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/28/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/29/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/01/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/01/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/06/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/06/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/07/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/07/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/22/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/26/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/27/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/16/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/17/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/24/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/26/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/07/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/07/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 05/17/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/18/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/06/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 06/18/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/20/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/25/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/10/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/24/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/31/2012