Text: H.R.4073 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-250 (01/10/2013)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 250]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 126 STAT. 2403]]

Public Law 112-250
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
   To authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to accept the quitclaim, 
  disclaimer, and relinquishment of a railroad right of way within and 
adjacent to Pike National Forest in El Paso County, Colorado, originally 
granted to the Mt. Manitou Park and Incline Railway Company pursuant to 
    the Act of March 3, 1875. <<NOTE: Jan. 10, 2013 -  [H.R. 4073]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. ACCEPTANCE OF RELINQUISHMENT OF RAILROAD RIGHT OF WAY 
                              BY MANITOU AND PIKES PEAK RAILWAY 
                              COMPANY, COLORADO, OVER NATIONAL 
                              FOREST SYSTEM LAND.

    (a) Authority To Accept.--Notwithstanding the Act of March 8, 1922 
(43 U.S.C. 912), the Secretary of Agriculture may accept the quitclaim, 
disclaimer, and relinquishment by the Manitou and Pikes Peak Railway 
Company, successor in interest to the Mt. Manitou Park and Incline 
Railway Company, of a right of way, more fully described in subsection 
(b), within and adjacent to Pike National Forest that was originally 
granted by the Secretary to the Mt. Manitou Park and Incline Railway 
Company pursuant to the authority provided by the Act of March 3, 1875 
(Chapter 152; 18 Stat. 482) for the construction of a railroad and 
station in El Paso County, Colorado.
    (b) Right of Way Described.--The railroad right of way referred to 
in subsection (a) is located in the S\1/2\ of section 6, Township 14 
South, Range 67 West, and N\1/2\SE \1/4\ of section 1, Township 14 
South, Range 68 West, Sixth Principal Meridian, Colorado, and is 
depicted in a tracing filed in the United States Land Office at Pueblo, 
Colorado, file 019416, on December 24, 1914.
    (c) Limited Applicability.--Nothing in this section shall be 
construed to affect the right, title, and interest of the Manitou

[[Page 126 STAT. 2404]]

and Pikes Peak Railway Company in land held in fee title by the Manitou 
and Pikes Peak Railway Company.

    Approved January 10, 2013.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 4073:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 112-599 (Comm. on Natural Resources).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 158 (2012):
            July 31, Aug. 1, considered and passed House.
            Dec. 30, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>