Committees: H.R.4078 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/17/2012 Referred to
04/26/2012 Markup by
07/20/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-461,Part 2
House Judiciary02/17/2012 Referred to
03/20/2012 Markup by
04/27/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-461,Part 1
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law02/23/2012 Referred to
02/27/2012 Hearings by
03/15/2012 Discharged from