Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/27/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 03/05/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/11/2012