Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/05/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/08/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/20/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/09/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/16/2012