Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/24/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/28/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/28/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/11/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/01/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/14/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/16/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/27/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/05/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/05/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/05/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/12/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/31/2012