There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

John F. Kennedy Center Reauthorization Act of 2012

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

John F. Kennedy Center Reauthorization Act of 2012

Short Titles as Reported to House

John F. Kennedy Center Reauthorization Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

John F. Kennedy Center Reauthorization Act of 2012

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

John F. Kennedy Center Reauthorization Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the John F. Kennedy Center Act to authorize appropriations for the John F. Kennedy Center for the Performing Arts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
06/08/2012Became Public Law No: 112-131. (TXT | PDF)
06/08/2012Signed by President.
05/31/2012Presented to President.
05/23/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3534)
05/07/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2296)
04/27/2012Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-457.
02/28/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/08/2012Became Public Law No: 112-131. (TXT | PDF)
06/08/2012Signed by President.
05/31/2012HousePresented to President.
05/24/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/23/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3534)
05/08/2012SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
05/07/2012-4:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/07/2012-4:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2296)
05/07/2012-4:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4097.
05/07/2012-4:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2296-2297)
05/07/2012-4:31pmHouseMr. Mica moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/27/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 319.
04/27/2012HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-457.
03/08/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/08/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/01/2012HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
03/01/2012HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
02/29/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/28/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/28/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 02/28/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/28/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/28/2012 Referred to
03/08/2012 Markup by
04/27/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-457
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management02/29/2012 Referred to
03/01/2012 Markup by
03/01/2012 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4097.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4097. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-131 (06/08/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

John F. Kennedy Center Reauthorization Act of 2012 - Allows the Trustees of the John F. Kennedy Center for the Performing Arts (the Board) to undertake such activities as may be necessary for the construction of a specified addition to the south end of the building of the John F. Kennedy Center for the Performing Arts (the expansion project).

Authorizes the Board to construct the expansion project and makes the Board responsible for the planning, design, engineering, and construction of the project. Requires the costs of those activities to be paid for using nonappropriated funds.

Declares that, all activities carried out under this Act shall be within the mission of the John. F. Kennedy Center for the Performing Arts (the Kennedy Center) to serve as the national center for such arts.

Instructs the Board: (1) before awarding a contract for the construction of the expansion project, to estimate any additional annual operations and maintenance costs (or savings) associated with the project; and (2) to account for any such additional costs in making a budget request for FY2014 and each fiscal year thereafter. Requires a final determination to proceed with such project to be based on the ability of the Board to accommodate any such identified additional costs within its other budget priorities.

Permits the Board to acknowledge private contributions used to carry out the interior portion of the expansion project, but prohibits the acknowledgement of private contributions used on the exterior portion.

Requires any acknowledgements of private contributions under this Act to be consistent with requirements under the John. F. Kennedy Center Act regarding the designation or installation of additional memorials or plaques in the nature of memorials in public areas of the Kennedy Center.

Authorizes appropriations for FY2013-FY2014 to the Board for: (1) maintenance, repair, and security; and (2) capital projects.