Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/22/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/22/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/22/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/28/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/28/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/18/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/27/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/09/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/17/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/05/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/26/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/09/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/09/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/09/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/12/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/18/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/18/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/25/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/10/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/10/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/10/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/19/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/20/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/20/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/20/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/20/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/20/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/20/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/20/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/20/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/20/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/20/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew