Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/08/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/19/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/19/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 03/19/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/15/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/15/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/18/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/18/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/18/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/29/2012