Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/08/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/08/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 03/08/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/19/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/19/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/09/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/15/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/15/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/18/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/21/2012