Refine your search

Refined by:

Louisiana Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/19/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/18/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/29/2012